MD SB92 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Public School Facility Construction Innovation Incentive Pilot Program to provide incentives to encourage public school systems to pursue innovative public school facility construction projects; requiring the Interagency Commission on School Construction to implement, administer, and promote the Incentive Program; requiring the Interagency Commission to approve a project that meets a certain cost threshold for participation in the Incentive Program; etc.
Title
Public School Construction – Innovation Incentive Pilot Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-2) (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-2) (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-2) (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-2) (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-2) |
2018-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {504966/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2018-04-09 | House | Hearing 4/09 at 11:00 a.m. |
2018-04-06 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2018-04-06 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (41-2) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {699032/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 2:30 p.m. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-10-27 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Appropriations
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Contracts
Counties
County Administrators
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Exemptions
General Assembly
Harford County
Minorities
Prices
Primary and Secondary Education
Prince George's County
Procurement
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Public Works, Board of
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Washington County
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Contracts
Counties
County Administrators
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Exemptions
General Assembly
Harford County
Minorities
Prices
Primary and Secondary Education
Prince George's County
Procurement
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Public Works, Board of
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Washington County