MD SB919 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-27 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-27 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from engaging in an activity or a strategy to implement a State Watershed Implementation Plan until the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency completes and publishes the 2017 Chesapeake Bay midpoint assessment and the University of Maryland Center for Environmental Science completes the 2-year study begun in 2015 to quantify and analyze the sediment and associated nutrients in major entry points to the Lower Susquehanna River Reservoir System and the upper Chesapeake Bay and other specified assessments; etc.
Title
Environment - Implementation of Watershed Implementation Plan - Limitation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Assessments
Chesapeake Bay
Environment
Environmental Health
Flood Control
Pollution
Rivers and Streams
Sediment Control
Chesapeake Bay
Environment
Environmental Health
Flood Control
Pollution
Rivers and Streams
Sediment Control