MD SB911 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the limitations on the amount of compensatory damages and punitive damages that may be awarded to a complainant in a certain unlawful employment case; increasing the period of time, from 2 years to 3 years, for which a claimant may recover back pay in a certain unlawful employment case; and increasing the period of time, from 2 years to 3 years, during which a complainant may file a civil action that alleges an unlawful employment practice that does not allege harassment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unlawful Employment Practice - Statute of Limitations and Remedies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12HouseMotion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted
2021-04-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {123623/1 Adopted
2021-04-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2021-03-25HouseHearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-03-17HouseReferred Economic Matters
2021-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-03-12SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {578278/1 Adopted
2021-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2021-02-09SenateHearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-02-09SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Government201009(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government201013(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback