MD SB911 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 360
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 360
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the authority, powers, and duties of officers and employees of the Field Enforcement Division in the Office of the Executive Director of the Alcohol and Tobacco Commission over certain matters; substituting references to the Division and the Commission, respectively, for references to the Comptroller in certain provisions relating to alcohol and tobacco; authorizing the officers and employees to make certain cooperative arrangements with the Office of the Comptroller; etc.
Title
Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Miller) Adopted (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Miller) Adopted (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 360 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-1) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2020-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-1) |
2020-03-15 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Miller) Adopted (130-0) |
2020-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {863398/1 Adopted |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2020-03-13 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Floor Amendment {803325/1 (Senator Bailey) Adopted |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {854631/1 Adopted |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB900 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 359
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Comptroller
Law Enforcement
Public Health
Public Officials
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sales and Use Tax
State Employees
Tobacco and Nicotine
Work, Labor and Employment
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Comptroller
Law Enforcement
Public Health
Public Officials
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sales and Use Tax
State Employees
Tobacco and Nicotine
Work, Labor and Employment