MD SB910 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a certain electric company to contract for certain renewable energy credits and electricity generated from certain Tier 1 renewable sources to meet a certain portion of the renewable energy portfolio standard for electricity that the electric company provides to certain customers beginning in 2020; requiring an electric company to solicit bids for a certain contract from certain renewable energy facilities; requiring an electric company to submit a certain contract to the Public Service Commission; applying the Act prospectively; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ratepayer Reduction for Renewable Energy Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15SenateUnfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
2019-03-13SenateHearing canceled
2019-03-04SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-21SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-14SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback