MD SB909 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland to use specified money to finance the purchase or lease of property only by one or more specified Southern Maryland counties, the Maryland Food Center Authority, or another entity, as determined by the Council, that is authorized to finance or purchase property; requiring the Council, under specified circumstances and in accordance with specified provisions of law, to issue a request for and to evaluate proposals and to select an entity to purchase or lease property; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Financing Purchase or Lease of Property by Other Entities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-12SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 207
2015-04-10SenatePassed Enrolled
2015-04-10SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2015-04-10SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2015-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
2015-04-08HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2015-04-08HouseFavorable with Amendments {773196/1 Report Adopted
2015-04-08HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2015-04-01HouseHearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-03-25HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2015-03-24SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2015-03-20SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2015-03-20SenateFavorable with Amendments {117772/1 Report Adopted
2015-03-20SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2015-03-19SenateHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-03-17SenateRereferred to Finance
2015-03-06SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0909&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2015rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/sb/sb0909f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/sb/sb0909t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/sb/sb0909e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/Chapters_noln/CH_207_sb0909e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2015RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0909_11777201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2015RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0909_77319601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/fnotes/bil_0009/sb0909.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/votes_comm/sb0909_fin.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/votes_comm/sb0909_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0909,s-0545&stab=02&ys=2015RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0909,h-0892&stab=02&ys=2015RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0909,s-0865&stab=02&ys=2015RS

Bill Comments

feedback