MD SB905 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-12 - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-12 - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each electric company and gas company and the Department of Housing and Community Development to procure or provide for its customers or certain individuals, beginning September 1, 2023, and every 3 years thereafter, certain energy efficiency, conservation, and greenhouse gas emissions reduction programs and services to encourage and promote the efficient use and conservation of energy in support of certain greenhouse gas emissions reduction goals and targets; etc.
Title
Electric Companies, Gas Companies, and the Department of Housing and Community Development - Energy Efficiency and Conservation Plans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-02-15 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB1035 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-07 - Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment
Subjects
Air Pollution
Commercial Property
Conservation
Energy
Energy Administration
Energy Matters
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Fuel
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Industry and Technology
internet
Low-Income
Notices
Prices
Public Service Commission
Reports
Residential Property
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Commercial Property
Conservation
Energy
Energy Administration
Energy Matters
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Fuel
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Industry and Technology
internet
Low-Income
Notices
Prices
Public Service Commission
Reports
Residential Property
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 211 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 221 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 222 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 223 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 224 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 225 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 510.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 20B-05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0905?ys=2023RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/sb/sb0905f.pdf |