MD SB905 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the State Highway Administration from issuing a permit for work to be conducted on State highways between 10:00 p.m. and 6:00 a.m. the following day unless a zoning official determines that issuing the permit is in the interest of public safety, health, or welfare; etc.
Title
State Highway Administration - Construction and Maintenance - Permit Requirements (Nighttime Construction Noise Reduction Act)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB84 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Subjects
Boundaries
Construction
Health
Highways
Licenses
Safety
State Highway Administration
Time
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Zoning and Planning
Construction
Health
Highways
Licenses
Safety
State Highway Administration
Time
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 8 | 662 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |