MD SB904 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making the crime of human trafficking in a case in which the victim of the crime is an adult a felony, rather than a misdemeanor; and making a conforming change.
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Adult Victim - Penalty
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-05 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Human Rights
Penalties and Sentences
Prostitution
Victims
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Human Rights
Penalties and Sentences
Prostitution
Victims