MD SB901 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a school bus may be operated in Kent County and Queen Anne's County for a period of 15 years under specified circumstances.
Title
Kent County and Queen Anne's County - School Buses - Length of Operation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358 |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2014-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-13 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {808579/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |