MD SB90 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB446
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment to create and maintain a database of supplemental environmental projects that the Department may consider for implementation as part of a settlement of an enforcement action; and requiring the Department to prioritize the selection of a supplemental environmental project located in the same geographic area as the alleged violation and to ensure that the scope and cost of a chosen project are sufficient to allow the Department and the alleged violator to reach a settlement.
Title
Department of the Environment - Supplemental Environmental Projects Database
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB446 (Carry Over) 2021-04-12 - Third Reading Passed (136-0)
HB595 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-11 - Referred Rules
HB595 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-11 - Referred Rules
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 1 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |