MD SB90 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - Second Reading Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - Second Reading Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a student in a public school or nonpublic school to refuse to participate in or observe, in whole or in part, classwork or an assessment that includes specified actions conducted on a specified animal; authorizing a student to exercise a specified right of refusal on the day the classwork or assessment is scheduled to be performed; requiring a specified student to complete specified classwork or a specified assessment by an alternate educational method determined by a specified teacher for a specified purpose; etc.
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Classwork and Assessment Involving Live and Dead Animals - Student Right of Refusal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable with Amendments Rejected (13-30) (Y: 13 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | Senate | Second Reading Failed |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Rejected (13-30) |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {714131/1 Adopted |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {714131/1 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 3:00 p.m. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-10-06 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Animals
Counties
Discrimination
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Examinations
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Rules and Regulations
Students
Teachers
Counties
Discrimination
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Examinations
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Rules and Regulations
Students
Teachers