MD SB90 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting the amount of the vessel excise tax to $15,000 for any vessel; altering the distribution of motor fuel tax revenue; requiring the Comptroller, after making specified distributions, to distribute 0.5% of the revenue to the Waterway Improvement Fund; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to submit reports describing the effect of the limitation on the vessel excise tax; etc.
Title
Natural Resources - Vessel Excise Tax - Waterway Improvement Fund
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (36-11) (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Senate Concur - House Amendments (34-12) (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (129-0) (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Senate Concur - House Amendments (34-12) (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (129-0) (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (36-11) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments (34-12) |
2013-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (129-0) |
2013-04-06 | House | Floor Committee Amendment {145560/1 Adopted |
2013-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {335669/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2013-04-04 | House | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-04-02 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2013-04-01 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {609634/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Boats and Ships
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Excise Tax
Fuel Tax
Industry and Technology
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Registration
Reports
Sunset
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Waterway Improvement Fund
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Excise Tax
Fuel Tax
Industry and Technology
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Registration
Reports
Sunset
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Waterway Improvement Fund