MD SB9 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the nonrefundable processing fee for return of an original document.
Title
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Return of an Original Document - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2018-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-31 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-10-11 | Senate | Pre-filed |