MD SB899 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that the duration of a term of probation for a certain child be consistent with certain treatment and rehabilitation needs of the child; specifying that the duration of a term of probation may not exceed a certain period of time, except under certain circumstances; and authorizing the juvenile court to require an additional term of probation, not to exceed 1 year, under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile Law - Probation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateHearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
2019-03-07SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-22SenateHearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-21SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-14SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback