MD SB899 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 728
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying that the compensation of the Executive Director for the State Retirement Agency and certain staff shall be as provided in the State budget; requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to adopt criteria for setting the qualifications and compensation of the Chief Investment Officer for the System; establishing the Objective Criteria Committee of the Board of Trustees to make recommendations regarding the compensation of the Chief Investment Officer and positions in the Investment Division; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Division

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-2) (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 728
2018-04-05SenatePassed Enrolled
2018-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-04-05SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2018-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (136-2)
2018-04-04HouseFloor Amendment {623823/1 (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted
2018-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {454768/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2018-03-29HouseHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-20HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2018-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-15SenateFavorable with Amendments {269237/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-02-22SenateHearing 2/22 at 8:30 a.m.
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0899&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0899f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0899t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0899e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_728_sb0899e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0899_26923701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0899_45476801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0899_62382301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0009/sb0899.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0899_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0630.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0899_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1044.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1140.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback