MD SB899 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 573
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 573
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the number of gaming permits to six that the Board of County Commissioners of Kent County may issue in a single year to an organization that meets specified qualifications.
Title
Kent County - Gaming - Permits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 573 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2014-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2014-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-26 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2014-03-21 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Churches
County Commissioners
Education
Fire Protection
Gaming
Kent County
Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Sports and Recreation
Veterans
Volunteers
Churches
County Commissioners
Education
Fire Protection
Gaming
Kent County
Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Sports and Recreation
Veterans
Volunteers