MD SB896 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Military Personnel and Veteran-Owned Small Business No-Interest Loan Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying the purpose of the Fund; requiring the Secretary of Business and Economic Development to administer the Fund; requiring the Department of Business and Economic Development, in consultation with the Department of Veterans Affairs, in making loans, to consider how to maximize the number of veterans, military reservists, and National Guard Personnel who would benefit from the loan program; etc.
Title
Military Personnel and Veteran-Owned Small Business No-Interest Loan Program and Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2015-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2015-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-20 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Floor Committee Amendment (Finance) {397472/1 Adopted |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {827872/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-03-04 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Economic and Community Development
Interest
Loans
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
Veterans
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Economic and Community Development
Interest
Loans
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
Veterans