MD SB894 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-09 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-09 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the Pricing Committee for Blind Industries and Services of Maryland and merging the function of the Committee with the Pricing Selection Committee for the Employment Works Program; altering the membership and duties of a specified pricing and selection committee; requiring the Governor's Office of Minority Affairs and the Department of General Services to report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before January 1 of each year; etc.
Title
Procurement Preferences - Pricing and Selection Committees
Sponsors
Sen. Catherine Pugh [D] | Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. Nathaniel McFadden [D] | Sen. Shirley Nathan-Pulliam [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {744733/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-04 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Blind Persons
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Contractors
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
General Services, Department of
Minorities
Prices
Procurement
Records
Reports
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Vocational Rehabilitation
Blind Persons
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Contractors
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
General Services, Department of
Minorities
Prices
Procurement
Records
Reports
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Vocational Rehabilitation