MD SB893 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission to approve provider applications for patients who have an opioid use disorder only if the patient has unsuccessfully tried all other traditional treatments or the patient will use the medical cannabis in conjunction with traditional therapies.
Title
Medical Cannabis - Provider Applications - Opioid Use Disorder
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (37-10) (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-15 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (37-10) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {618377/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-14 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Cannabis
Committees and Commissions
Health
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Opioids
Patients
Public Health
Substance Abuse
Committees and Commissions
Health
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Opioids
Patients
Public Health
Substance Abuse