MD SB89 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-27 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-27 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Board of Regents for the University System of Maryland to adopt a plan on or before July 1, 2023, to establish a regional higher education center in Charles County to provide students in Charles County with access to established, cutting-edge, and high-demand academic programs of degree-granting institutions; and requiring the Board of Regents to implement the plan to establish a regional higher education center in Charles County on or before July 1, 2028.
Title
University System of Maryland - Regional Higher Education Center - Charles County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-11-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Budgets
Charles County
Committees and Commissions
Higher Education
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Charles County
Committees and Commissions
Higher Education
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0089?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0089f.pdf |