MD SB89 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the standards for certification of a voting system by the State Board of Elections to include a requirement that the voting system accommodate multiple methods of voting, including ranked choice voting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Elections - Certification of Voting Systems - Standards

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2020-02-11SenateRe-referred Budget and Taxation (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
2020-02-11SenateFavorable
2020-02-10SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-01-15SenateHearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.
2020-01-15SenateHearing canceled
2020-01-15SenateHearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-08SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-09-26SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Election Law9102(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback