MD SB89 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-25 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-25 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing specified provisions of law relating to the provision of benefits for specified substance abuse services by managed care organizations to specified enrollees in the Maryland Medical Assistance Program; requiring a managed care organization to provide or arrange to provide substance-related disorder services for children in State supervised care; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to establish a delivery system for substance-related disorder services; etc.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Provision of Substance Use Services to Enrollees of Managed Care Organizations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-25 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Drugs
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Medical Assistance
Mental Health
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Reports
Review Boards
Substance Abuse
Drugs
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Medical Assistance
Mental Health
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Reports
Review Boards
Substance Abuse