MD SB889 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Office of Student Financial Assistance to assist in the repayment of specified higher education loans owed by recipients of a Nancy Grasmick Teacher Award who receive specified degrees from specified institutions; altering a specified definition to authorize a specified student attending an institution of higher education outside the State to qualify for a Walter Sondheim Jr. Public Service Summer Internship Scholarship; and altering qualifications for eligibility for a specified scholarship.
Title
Nancy Grasmick Teacher Award and Walter Sondheim Jr. Public Service Summer Internship Scholarship - Qualifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-11 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Higher Education
Loans
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Teachers
Higher Education
Loans
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Teachers