MD SB885 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 833
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 833
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State, a county, a municipality, or any other local government to provide to an organizer of a special event a written statement that describes specified requirements and penalties before issuing a permit for the special event; providing a maximum civil penalty of $300 for each day a violation of the Act exists.
Title
Environment - Recycling - Special Events
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (118-19) (Y: 118 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (37-9) (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (37-9) (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 833 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (118-19) |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-15 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (37-9) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {464839/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |