MD SB882 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to convene a stakeholder workgroup to examine assisted outpatient programs, assertive community treatment programs and other specified outpatient services programs, to develop a specified proposal, and to evaluate a specified standard; requiring the Secretary to submit a report of the workgroup's findings and recommendations to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before November 1, 2014; etc.
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Outpatient Services Programs Stakeholder Workgroup
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {586385/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {207671/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Procedure Act
Advance Medical Directives
Advertising
Appeals
Committees and Commissions
Discrimination
Drugs
Emergency Medical Services
Food
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Insurance
Housing
Long-Term Care
Medical Assistance
Mental Health
Patients
Petitions
Psychiatrists
Psychologists
Public Health
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Social Services
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Transportation
Violence
Work, Labor and Employment
Advance Medical Directives
Advertising
Appeals
Committees and Commissions
Discrimination
Drugs
Emergency Medical Services
Food
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Insurance
Housing
Long-Term Care
Medical Assistance
Mental Health
Patients
Petitions
Psychiatrists
Psychologists
Public Health
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Social Services
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Transportation
Violence
Work, Labor and Employment