MD SB882 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that, for specified weeks of unemployment, a State "on" indicator for extended unemployment benefits exists under specified circumstances; specifying that a State "off" indicator exists for specified extended unemployment benefits under specified circumstances; prohibiting specified extended benefits from being payable for any week of unemployment beginning before a specified date; establishing the Extended Benefits Fund; stating the purpose of the Fund and the intent of the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Federal Extended Benefits for the Long-Term Unemployed
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2011-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (97-43) | |
2011-04-06 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-09 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-04-09 | Re-referred Economic Matters | |
2011-04-04 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2011-04-07 | Returned Passed | |
2011-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (39-8) | |
2011-04-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-03 | Floor Committee Amendment (Finance) Adopted | |
2011-04-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-02 | Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Jones-Rodwell) Adopted | |
2011-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-04-02 | Laid Over (Senator Jacobs) Adopted | |
2011-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2011-03-01 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-28 | Re-referred Finance | |
2011-02-18 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Appropriations
Counties
Federal Government
Insurance
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Unemployment
Counties
Federal Government
Insurance
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Unemployment