MD SB88 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Consolidating the Mortgage Lender-Originator Fund, the Money Transmission Fund, and the Debt Management Services Fund into a single fund known as the Nondepository Special Fund; providing the purpose of the Nondepository Special Fund is to cover the direct and indirect costs of fulfilling the statutory and regulatory duties of the Commissioner under specified circumstances; requiring specified revenues, fees, and examination assessments to be credited to the Nondepository Special Fund to be used for a specified purpose; etc.
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consolidation of Nondepository Special Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendment |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0) |
2016-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {383791/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-26 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {757573/1 Report Adopted |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-10-27 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agents and Brokers
Appropriations
Assessments
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Debt Management
Electronic Funds Transfer
Fees
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Fines
Licenses
Mortgages
Registration
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Treasurers
Agents and Brokers
Appropriations
Assessments
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Debt Management
Electronic Funds Transfer
Fees
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Fines
Licenses
Mortgages
Registration
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Treasurers