MD SB878 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Generally curing previous Acts of the General Assembly with possible title defects.
Title
Annual Curative Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/3 (Senator King) Adopted |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Favorable |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Senate Rules |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 2104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 2 | 513 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 3 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 3 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 5 | 648 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 10 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Correctional Services | 9 | 609.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |