MD SB877 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Promoting ext-Raordinary Innovation in Maryland's Economy Program within the Department of Commerce to provide certain Fortune 100 companies tax credits and benefits for up to 10 years; requiring the Department to administer the Program; establishing the application and eligibility requirements for a business entity to qualify for tax credits and benefits under the Program; authorizing a credit against the State income tax for certain income of business entities certified under the Program; etc.
Title
Promoting ext-Raordinary Innovation in Maryland's Economy (PRIME Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (78-60) (Y: 79 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (34-12) (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {663425/1 (Senator Rosapepe) Rejected (8-35) (Y: 9 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (34-12) (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {663425/1 (Senator Rosapepe) Rejected (8-35) (Y: 9 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (78-60) |
2018-04-04 | House | Motion vote previous question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-29 | House | Special Order until 3/30 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted |
2018-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (34-12) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Floor Amendment {663425/1 (Senator Rosapepe) Rejected (8-35) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Floor Amendment {263626/2 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {839230/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Finance |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Comptroller
Construction
Counties
Credit
Disclosure
Economic and Community Development
Exemptions
Forms
Income Tax
Insurance
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Privacy
Property Tax
Public Works
Real Property
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Sales and Use Tax
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Property
Taxes - Sales and Use
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Utilities
Work, Labor and Employment
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Comptroller
Construction
Counties
Credit
Disclosure
Economic and Community Development
Exemptions
Forms
Income Tax
Insurance
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Privacy
Property Tax
Public Works
Real Property
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Sales and Use Tax
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Property
Taxes - Sales and Use
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Utilities
Work, Labor and Employment