MD SB877 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an action to foreclose a mortgage or deed of trust on residential property to be commenced by filing a complaint; requiring practice and procedure in an action to foreclose a mortgage or deed of trust on residential property to be governed by Title 2 of the Maryland Rules; prohibiting a foreclosure sale of residential property from occurring until at least 30 days after the court enters judgment in favor of the secured party; etc.
Title
Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Ulysses Currie [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. Nathaniel McFadden [D] |
Sen. Anthony Muse [D] | Sen. Victor Ramirez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-02 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Administrative Hearings, Office of
Civil Actions
Deeds
Foreclosure
Interest
Judgments
Mortgages
Notices
Process Serving
Real Estate
Real Property
Reports
Security Interests
Time
Civil Actions
Deeds
Foreclosure
Interest
Judgments
Mortgages
Notices
Process Serving
Real Estate
Real Property
Reports
Security Interests
Time