MD SB875 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering alcoholic beverages license fees within Baltimore County.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Baltimore County - License Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 111 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (111-24) | |
2011-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-03-20 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2011-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (44-3) | |
2011-03-18 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-18 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-18 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-02 | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-28 | Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-17 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore County
County Councils
County Executives
Fees
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore County
County Councils
County Executives
Fees