MD SB873 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definitions of "qualified position" and "State priority funding area" for purposes of the job creation tax credit program; requiring the Department of Commerce to certify the amount of the tax credit for which a qualified business entity is eligible; altering the calculation of the credits earned under the program; prohibiting the Department from certifying tax credits in a taxable year in excess of $4,000,000; applying the Act to job creation tax credits certified after December 31, 2017; etc.
Title
Economic Development - Job Creation Tax Credit - Alteration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2017-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2017-03-22 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {839930/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Claims
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Commercial Rehabilitation
Committees and Commissions
Disclosure
Economic and Community Development
Insurance
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Reports
Tax Credits
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Commercial Rehabilitation
Committees and Commissions
Disclosure
Economic and Community Development
Insurance
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Reports
Tax Credits