MD SB871 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-11 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-11 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the policy of the State to promote and encourage the creation of accessory dwelling units on land zoned for single-family residential use in order to meet the housing needs of the citizens of the State; requiring, on or before October 1, 2023, each legislative body to adopt a local law authorizing the development of accessory dwelling units on land zoned for single-family residential use subject to certain requirements; etc.
Title
Accessory Dwelling Unit Authorization and Promotion Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB1259 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-14 - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Baltimore City
Chartered Counties
Code Counties
Condominiums
Construction
Counties
Development Fees and Taxes
Excise Tax
Fees
Homeowners Associations
Housing
Land Records
Laws and Ordinances
Leases and Rent
Local Government - Generally
Local Government Mandates
Parking
Planning, Department of
Real Property
Reports
Residential Property
Utilities
Zoning and Planning
Chartered Counties
Code Counties
Condominiums
Construction
Counties
Development Fees and Taxes
Excise Tax
Fees
Homeowners Associations
Housing
Land Records
Laws and Ordinances
Leases and Rent
Local Government - Generally
Local Government Mandates
Parking
Planning, Department of
Real Property
Reports
Residential Property
Utilities
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Land Use | 1 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Land Use | 1 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Land Use | 10 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Land Use | 4 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Land Use | 4 | 502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Land Use | 4 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Land Use | 4 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Land Use | 4 | 505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Land Use | 4 | 506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Land Use | 4 | 507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Land Use | 4 | 508 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Land Use | 4 | 509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 2 | 126 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0871?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0871f.pdf |