MD SB867 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 566
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 566
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a specified violation relating to an employer failing to report an accidental personal injury within a specified time required under the workers' compensation law to require the violation to be a knowing violation; and increasing the penalty from up to $50 to a maximum of $500 imposed on an employer for a specified violation.
Title
Workers' Compensation - Failure to Report Accidental Personal Injury - Penalty
Sponsors
Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Thomas Middleton [D] | Sen. Barbara Robinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (108-30) (Y: 108 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 566 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (108-30) |
2017-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-03-21 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {637571/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |