MD SB867 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education to support and facilitate specified oral health education, develop a process to monitor specified implementation of oral health education, and submit a summary to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 1, 2015 and every 5 years thereafter; requiring the State Board of Education to encourage specified county boards of education to incorporate specified lessons into the boards' health education curriculum; etc.
Title
State Department of Education - Oral Health Education
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. Roy Dyson [D] | Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] |
Sen. Bryan Simonaire [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-1) | |
2012-03-29 | Floor Committee Amendment 505262/1 Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2012-03-23 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-17 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2012-03-30 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-30 | Senate Concur - House Amendment | |
2012-03-16 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-14 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-14 | Favorable with Amendments 784739/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 3/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Counties
Dentists
Diseases
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Health
Reports
Dentists
Diseases
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Health
Reports