MD SB865 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the name of the Edward T. Conroy Memorial Scholarship Program to the Edward T. and Mary A. Conroy Memorial Scholarship Program; and altering the eligibility requirements for the Edward T. and Mary A. Conroy Memorial Scholarship Program and the Jean B. Cryor Memorial Scholarship Program to include the stepchildren of specified individuals who are at least 16 years of age.
Title
Edward T. and Mary A. Conroy and Jean B. Cryor Memorial Scholarship Programs - Eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2015-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2015-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-25 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {354132/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-26 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Armed Forces
General Assembly
Higher Education
Law Enforcement
Minors
Names
Public Employees
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Teachers
Victims
Violence
General Assembly
Higher Education
Law Enforcement
Minors
Names
Public Employees
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Teachers
Victims
Violence