MD SB863 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending for an additional year to June 30, 2017, the termination date for the Workgroup to Study Safe Harbor Policy for Youth Victims of Human Trafficking; and requiring the Workgroup to submit a supplemental report on or before December 1, 2016.
Title
Workgroup to Study Safe Harbor Policy for Youth Victims of Human Trafficking - Sunset Extension
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Richard Madaleno [D] | Sen. Roger Manno [D] |
Sen. Victor Ramirez [D] | Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] | Sen. Craig Zucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2016-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2016-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-17 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedure
Human Rights
Reports
Safety
Social Services
Sunset
Victims
Youth
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedure
Human Rights
Reports
Safety
Social Services
Sunset
Victims
Youth