MD SB860 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Hearing: Mar 27 @ 1:00 pm House Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting certain persons from being subject to revocation of mandatory supervision, parole, or probation for the medical use of or possession of medical cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Immunity - Revocation of Release

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-3) (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-11HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2019-03-08SenateThird Reading Passed (43-3)
2019-03-06SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-06SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-05SenateSpecial Order until 3/6 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2019-03-05SenateFavorable
2019-03-04SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback