MD SB86 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 668
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring $100 of the annual fees as well as the late fees paid by a charitable organization for failure to timely file a registration that are collected by the Secretary of State to be distributed to the Charitable Enforcement Fund, to be used to support the actions of the Secretary of State and the Attorney General to carry out certain duties relating to the protection of charitable assets and the enforcement of the Maryland Solicitations Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charitable Organizations - Registration Late Fees - Distribution and Use

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 668
2018-04-09SenateReturned Passed
2018-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2018-03-30HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-30HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-30HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2018-03-28HouseHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-31HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2018-01-30SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-01-26SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-01-26SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-01-25SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-01-16SenateHearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-10SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2017-09-13SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback