MD SB858 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 842
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 842
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which a person, whose business or property has been injured or threatened with injury by a violation of specified provisions of law, may maintain an action for damages, an injunction, or both, against any person who has committed the violation, regardless of whether the person maintaining the action dealt directly or indirectly with the person who has committed the violation; altering a specified defense that a defendant may raise in specified actions for damages; etc.
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Indirect Purchasers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (90-49) (Y: 90 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 842 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (90-49) |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-03-21 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {457570/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Antitrust Enforcement
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Generally
Damages
Personal Property
Real Property
Threats
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Generally
Damages
Personal Property
Real Property
Threats