MD SB858 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing racing license holders to appeal an ejection by racing licensees to the State Racing Commission; authorizing the Commission to refuse to hear appeals under specified circumstances; providing for the filing of appeals with the Commission; requiring licensees to provide written statements to a license holder; requiring the Commission to conduct hearings in accordance with the Administrative Procedures Act; authorizing the Commission to take specified actions after a hearing; etc.
Title
State Racing Commission - Ejections from Race Tracks - Appeals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2013-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Appeals
Committees and Commissions
Hearings
Horse Racing
Licenses
Notices
Public Information
Racing
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Hearings
Horse Racing
Licenses
Notices
Public Information
Racing
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor and Employment