MD SB857 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the distribution of certain proceeds of table games paid to Baltimore City; requiring that 49.5% of the proceeds be used for school construction projects, 49.5% of the proceeds are to be used for recreational facilities and 1% of the proceeds is to be paid to the Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account; and providing that the proceeds of table games paid to Baltimore City to be used for recreational facilities may be used only to supplement and not to supplant existing expenses or obligations.
Title
Baltimore City - Table Games Proceeds - Distribution and Recreational Facilities
Sponsors
Sen. Nathaniel Oaks [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Nathaniel McFadden [D] | Sen. Shirley Nathan-Pulliam [D] |
Sen. Barbara Robinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 2:15 p.m. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 2:45 p.m. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |