MD SB853 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB146
Note: Carry Over of previous SB698
Note: Carry Over of previous SB698
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the Maryland Uniform Disclaimer of Property Interests Act to provide for the disclaimer of nonprobate transfers at death; providing for the creation, revocation, recordation, and effects of a transfer-on-death deed for real property; requiring the Administrative Office of the Courts to develop an informational sheet regarding transfer-on-death deeds for use at courthouses and on the website for the Maryland courts; providing example forms for the creation and revocation of a transfer-on-death deed; etc.
Title
Maryland Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
SB853 (Carry Over) 2022-02-09 - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
SB698 (Carry Over) 2021-03-20 - Referred Environment and Transportation
HB1270 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-23 - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
SB698 (Carry Over) 2021-03-20 - Referred Environment and Transportation
HB1270 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-23 - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Beneficiaries
Clerks of Court
Communications
Counties
Courts
Death
Deeds
Electronic Government
Estates and Trusts
Forms
Insurance
internet
Land Records
Public Information
Publications
Real Property
Recordation
Retirement
Revenue and Taxes
Securities
Transfer Tax
Beneficiaries
Clerks of Court
Communications
Counties
Courts
Death
Deeds
Electronic Government
Estates and Trusts
Forms
Insurance
internet
Land Records
Public Information
Publications
Real Property
Recordation
Retirement
Revenue and Taxes
Securities
Transfer Tax
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0853?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0853f.pdf |