MD SB853 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 17
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that certain general contractors are jointly and severally liable for certain violations of the wage payment and collection law by a subcontractor regardless of whether the subcontractor is in a direct contractual relationship with the general contractor; requiring a subcontractor to indemnify a general contractor for certain wages, damages, interest, penalties, or fees except under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor and Employment - General Contractor Liability for Unpaid Wages

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-14) (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (85-48) (Y: 86 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-14) (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 17
2018-03-28SenatePassed Enrolled
2018-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (31-14)
2018-03-28SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2018-03-26HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (85-48)
2018-03-26HouseMotion vote previous question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted
2018-03-26HouseSpecial Order until later this session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
2018-03-23HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-23HouseFavorable with Amendments {763292/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-23HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2018-03-20HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2018-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (33-14)
2018-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-15SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-14SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-03-08SenateHearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0853&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0853f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0853t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0853e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_17_sb0853e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0853_76329201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0003/sb0853.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0853_fin.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0853_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0626.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0845.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0860.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback