MD SB85 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the eligibility requirements for tuition waivers for foster care recipients to include individuals who resided in an out-of-home placement on or after the individual's 13th birthday for at least 1 year and reunited with at least one of the individual's parents; and altering the length of time from 5 to 10 years during which certain individuals continue to be exempt from certain tuition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tuition Waivers - Foster Care Recipients - Eligibility

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 369
2018-04-02SenateReturned Passed
2018-03-30HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2018-03-29HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-29HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-29HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2018-03-22HouseHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-09HouseRereferred to Ways and Means
2018-03-06HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-20HouseHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-24HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2018-01-23SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-01-19SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-01-19SenateFavorable with Amendments {184634/1 Report Adopted
2018-01-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-01-17SenateHearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-10SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2017-09-27SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback