MD SB841 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing certain community solar energy generating systems as a subclass of personal property; providing that the county tax rate applicable to certain community solar energy generating systems may be a different rate from the county tax rate applicable to other personal property, subject to a certain limitation; authorizing a county or municipal government body to exempt, by law, personal property that is a certain community solar energy generating system from a county or municipal corporation property tax under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Property Tax - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {679238/1 Adopted |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {679238/1 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB954 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-03 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Assessments
Corporations
Counties
Equipment
Exemptions
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Personal Property
Property Tax
Solar Energy
Taxes - Property
Taxes - Property - Local
Corporations
Counties
Equipment
Exemptions
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Personal Property
Property Tax
Solar Energy
Taxes - Property
Taxes - Property - Local
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 306.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 6 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 7 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 8 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 8 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |