MD SB84 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing a requirement that a signature be in ink on an application for a certificate of title of a vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Certificate of Title Application - Signature Requirement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 140
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-12HouseHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-01HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-01-31SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-01-29SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-01-29SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-01-25SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-01-09SenateHearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-10-09SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback