MD SB839 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 883
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 883
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Defining "damages" or "losses" in statutory causes of action to protect civil rights or consumer rights and providing that "damages" or "losses" includes reasonable nominal damages.
Title
General Provisions - Damages or Losses - Definition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 105 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 883 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (105-30) |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2024-03-15 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB832 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 884
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
General Provisions | 1 | 107.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |