MD SB839 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing provisions on brewing company off-site permits, distillery off-site permits, and winery off-site permits; establishing a manufacturer's off-site permit with certain privileges; authorizing the Comptroller to issue a permit to the holder of certain manufacturer's licenses; authorizing a permit holder to sell and provide products at events; requiring an employee trained in alcohol awareness to be present at events; authorizing a certain license holder to sell a certain volume of beer at a permitted event; etc.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Permits and Brewery Limits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {844432/1 Adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Agriculture
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Communications
Comptroller
Fairs
Fees
Forms
Job Training
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Special Events
Substance Abuse
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor and Employment
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Communications
Comptroller
Fairs
Fees
Forms
Job Training
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Special Events
Substance Abuse
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 2 | 130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 2 | 132.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 2 | 133 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 2 | 140 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 2 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 2 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 2 | 212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |